EP0428694 - GOLF PUTTING PRACTICE APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.01.1992 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 04.11.2009 [2009/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SKELLEY, Keith 115 Broadmeadow Cove Roswell, GA 30075 / US | For all designated states SKELLEY, William G. 115 Broadmeadow Cove Roswell, GA 30075 / US | [1991/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1991/22] | Representative(s) | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al Avidity IP Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [1991/22] | Hepworth, John Malcolm, et al Hepworth Lawrence Bryer & Bizley Bloxam Court Corporation Street Rugby, Warwickshire CV21 2DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 90909288.4 | 12.06.1990 | [1991/22] | WO1990US03310 | Priority number, date | US19890364175 | 12.06.1989 Original published format: US 364175 | [1991/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9015645 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0428694 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 27.12.1990 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1991/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 27.12.1990 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.09.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/36 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
A63B69/3676 (EP,US);
A63B69/36211 (EP,US);
A63B2071/024 (EP,US);
A63B2210/50 (EP,US);
A63B2225/09 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1991/22] | Title | German: | GOLFÜBUNGSGERÄT FÜR DAS PUTTEN | [1991/22] | English: | GOLF PUTTING PRACTICE APPARATUS | [1991/22] | French: | APPAREIL POUR S'ENTRAINER A POTER AU GOLF | [1991/22] | File destroyed: | 15.03.1999 | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.1991 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.1991 | Search fee paid | 01.03.1991 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.06.1991 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/32] | 26.11.1991 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1992/12] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4071251 (BECKISH JOHN); | [Y]US2776836 (FRANK ZADINA ARTHUR); | [Y]DE1815248 (MARK JOSEPH A); | [Y]GB1258446 ; | [A]GB2192797 (MASSIE ROBERT CHAPMAN) | International search | [X]US1944942 (MACDONALD ROBERT G); | [X]US3339927 (NUNN ROBERT R); | [X]US3806133 (CORK D); | [X]US3953035 (BECKISK JOHN); | [A]US3482838 (GIBSON SIDNEY H, et al); | [A]US3857570 (GUTIERREZ R, et al); | [A]US4230319 (LINDNER MAX E); | [A]US4423875 (MILLER GARDNER H [US]); | [A]US4437669 (PELZ DAVID T [US]); | [A]US4563010 (MCDORMAN KIM C [US], et al); | [A]US4736952 (TAFT CARLTON R [US], et al) |