Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH04212288 | Global Dossier | 03.08.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US46646790 | 17.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0438100 | Global Dossier | 24.07.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46646790 | 17.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2034284 | 18.07.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US46646790 | 17.01.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5018057 | 21.05.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US46646790 | 17.01.1990 |