EP0438100 - Touch initiated light module [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 03.08.1992 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 23.09.1992 [1992/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LAMP TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 922 El Rincon Road Danville California 94526 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/30] | For all designated states LAMP TECHNOLOGIES, INC. 922 El Rincon Road Danville, California 94526 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Biggs, John D. 922 El Rincon Road Danville, Calif. 94526 / US | 02 /
Twain, Kenneth M. 4209 Tompkins Avenue Oakland, Calif. 94619 / US | [1991/30] | Representative(s) | Casalonga, Alain, et al BUREAU D.A. CASALONGA - JOSSE Morassistrasse 8 D-80469 München / DE | [1991/30] | Application number, filing date | 91100373.9 | 14.01.1991 | [1991/30] | Priority number, date | US19900466467 | 17.01.1990 Original published format: US 466467 | [1991/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0438100 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F21V23/04, F21L11/00 | [1991/30] | CPC: |
A45C15/06 (EP,US);
F21V23/00 (EP,US);
F21V33/0012 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/30] | Title | German: | Leuchte mit Berührungsschalter | [1991/30] | English: | Touch initiated light module | [1991/30] | French: | Lampe avec commutateur à effleurement | [1991/30] | File destroyed: | 17.02.2000 | Examination procedure | 27.01.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/39] | 29.04.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/39] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE2603223 (INSTA ELEKTRO GES MBH & CO KG); | [Y]US4623957 (MOORE RALPH F [US], et al); | [Y]FR2608731 (LEVY CHRISTOPHE [FR]) |