EP0443606 - 4-(4-alkoxyphenyl)-2-butylamine derivatives and process therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1991/35] | 4-(4-alkoxyphenyl)-2-butylamine derivative and process therefor | ||
[1995/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 15.03.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIONOGI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA trading under the name of SHIONOGI & CO. LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | For all designated states SHIONOGI SEIYAKU KABUSHIKI KAISHA trading under the name of SHIONOGI & CO. LTD. 1-8, Doshomachi 3-chome, Chuo-ku Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hagishita, Sanji 502, Kose Gose-shi, Nara / JP | 02 /
Seno, Kaoru 1-10-19, Hinokuchi-cho Nishinomiya-shi, Hyogo / JP | [1991/35] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstrasse 3 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1991/35] | VOSSIUS & PARTNER Postfach 86 07 67 D-81634 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91102630.0 | 22.02.1991 | [1991/35] | Priority number, date | JP19900043547 | 23.02.1990 Original published format: JP 4354790 | [1991/35] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0443606 | Date: | 28.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/35] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0443606 | Date: | 25.03.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0443606 | Date: | 10.05.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C07C217/62, C07C213/02 | [1991/35] | CPC: |
C07C217/62 (EP,US);
C07C215/46 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1991/35] | Title | German: | 4-(4-Alkoxyphenyl)-2-Butylaminderivate und deren Herstellungsverfahren | [1991/35] | English: | 4-(4-alkoxyphenyl)-2-butylamine derivatives and process therefor | [1995/19] | French: | Dérivés de 4-(4-Alkoxyphényl)-2-butylamine et leur procédé de préparation | [1991/35] |
Former [1991/35] | 4-(4-alkoxyphenyl)-2-butylamine derivative and process therefor | Examination procedure | 29.04.1992 | Examination requested [1992/26] | 04.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.09.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 10.10.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.01.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 18.01.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/18] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | GR | 10.05.1995 | [2000/05] | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP02306942 ; | [AD]US3987200 (TUTTLE RONALD R, et al); | [A]EP0023385 (BEECHAM GROUP PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0092787 (SCHERING CORP [US]) | [L] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 114, no. 19, 13 May 1991, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract no. 184966W, page 736 ;column 2 ; | [AP] - & JP-A-02306942 ( TORAY INDUSTRIES ) 20 december1990, & JP02306942 A 00000000 | Examination | JP02306942 | - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 114, no. 19, 13 May 1991, Columbus, Ohio, US; abstract n:o 184966W, page 736, column 2; & JP-A-02306942 (TORAY INDUSTRIES)20 december 1990, & JP02306942 A 19901220 |