Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
15.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.05.1996 [1996/18] |
24.03.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 10.05.1995 [1995/19] |
26.04.1993 | First examination report | |
12.11.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 02.01.1992 [1992/01] |
25.10.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 11.12.1991 [1991/50] |