Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4017575 | 05.12.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4017575 | 31.05.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4017576 | 05.12.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4017576 | 31.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0460451 | Global Dossier | 10.05.1995 | B1 | EP0460451 | 11.12.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4017575 | 31.05.1990 | DE4017576 | 31.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59105416D1 | 14.06.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4017575 | 31.05.1990 | DE4017576 | 31.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5266171 | 30.11.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4017575 | 31.05.1990 | DE4017576 | 31.05.1990 |