Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0467219
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
09.07.1999 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 25.08.1999 [1999/34] |
17.07.1998 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] |
09.07.1998 |
Renewal fee |
|
02.06.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
05.02.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
05.02.1998 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.10.1997 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
15.08.1997 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.10.1997 [1997/40] |
03.07.1997 |
Renewal fee |
|
15.04.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
22.01.1997 |
Examination report or reply |
|
07.08.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
28.06.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
22.03.1996 |
First examination report |
|
19.03.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
31.05.1995 |
Change - applicant |
published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] |
23.05.1995 |
Change - applicant |
published on 12.07.1995 [1995/28] |
12.05.1995 |
Change - applicant |
published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] |
12.05.1995 |
Change - representative |
published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] |
03.02.1994 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] |
01.04.1993 |
Publication of search report |
published on 19.05.1993 [1993/20] |
07.12.1991 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] |