Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5202261 | 13.04.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US55439390 | 19.07.1990 | US79318091 | 18.11.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5250439 | 05.10.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US99034092 | 14.12.1992 | US55439390 | 19.07.1990 | US79318091 | 18.11.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0622793 | Global Dossier | 01.02.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US55439390 | 19.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU635432B | Global Dossier | 18.03.1993 | B2 | AU8029991 | 23.01.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US55439390 | 19.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0467219 | Global Dossier | 02.09.1998 | B1 | EP0467219 | 19.05.1993 | A3 | EP0467219 | 22.01.1992 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US55439390 | 19.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE170568T | 15.09.1998 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US55439390 | 19.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2043807 | 20.01.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US55439390 | 19.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69130093T | 21.01.1999 | T2 | DE69130093D1 | 08.10.1998 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US55439390 | 19.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0467219T | 31.05.1999 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US55439390 | 19.07.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2119749T | 16.10.1998 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US55439390 | 19.07.1990 |