Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.1995 [1995/28] |
03.06.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 20.07.1994 [1994/29] |
27.07.1993 | Change - designated states | published on 15.09.1993 [1993/37] |
15.09.1992 | First examination report | |
29.04.1992 | Change - German title | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] |
29.04.1992 | Change - English title | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] |
10.04.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] |
10.04.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.05.1992 [1992/22] |