Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH0554838B | Global Dossier | 13.08.1993 | B2 | JPH04269591 | 25.09.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US61652490 | 21.11.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0486994 | Global Dossier | 20.07.1994 | B1 | EP0486994 | 27.05.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61652490 | 21.11.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2054448 | 22.05.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US61652490 | 21.11.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69102976T | 23.03.1995 | T2 | DE69102976D1 | 25.08.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US61652490 | 21.11.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5026679 | 25.06.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | US61652490 | 21.11.1990 |