EP0486994 - Mixture of dyes for cyan dye donor for thermal color proofing [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1992/22] | Mixture of dyes for cyan dye donor for thermal clor proofing | ||
[1992/25] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 12.07.1995 [1995/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Kodak Company 343 State Street Rochester, NY 14650-2201 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | For all designated states EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Evans, Steven, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | 02 /
Chapman, Derek David, c/o EASTMAN KODAK COMPANY Patent Department, 343 State Street Rochester, New York 14650-2201 / US | [1992/22] | Representative(s) | Brandes, Jürgen, et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/22] | Brandes, Jürgen, Dr. rer. nat., et al Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 D-81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 91119647.5 | 18.11.1991 | [1992/22] | Priority number, date | US19900616524 | 21.11.1990 Original published format: US 616524 | [1992/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0486994 | Date: | 27.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0486994 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B41M5/38, G03F3/10 | [1992/22] | CPC: |
B41M5/39 (EP,US);
Y10S428/913 (EP,US);
Y10S428/914 (EP,US);
Y10S430/146 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24802 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, NL [1993/37] |
Former [1992/22] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Mischung von Farbstoffen für Blaugrün-Farbstoff-Donor für thermische Farbabzüge | [1992/25] | English: | Mixture of dyes for cyan dye donor for thermal color proofing | [1992/25] | French: | Mélange de colorants pour donneur de colorant cyan pour épreuve coloré obtenu par le procédé thermique | [1992/22] |
Former [1992/22] | Mischung von Farbstoffen für Blaugrün-farbstoff-Donor für thermische Farbabzüge | ||
Former [1992/22] | Mixture of dyes for cyan dye donor for thermal clor proofing | Examination procedure | 25.03.1992 | Examination requested [1992/22] | 17.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 29.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 17.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0383212 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0361197 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]US4788284 (MASUKAWA TOYOAKI [JP], et al); | [AD]EP0270677 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD [JP]) |