Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] |
17.03.1995 | (Expected) grant | published on 03.05.1995 [1995/18] |
07.03.1994 | First examination report | |
17.12.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 03.02.1993 [1993/05] |
02.12.1992 | Publication of search report | published on 20.01.1993 [1993/03] |
30.04.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 17.06.1992 [1992/25] |