EP0490136 - Hot setting adhesive [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.03.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.04.1996 [1996/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 20245 Hamburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/25] | For all designated states Beiersdorf Aktiengesellschaft Unnastrasse 48 D-20245 Hamburg / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Engeldinger, Hans Karl Holtwisch 12 W-2000 Hamburg 54 / DE | 02 /
Siepmann, Jürgen Kirchenstrasse 7 W-2082 Moorrege / DE | 03 /
Kramer, Jürgen, Dr. Stieglitzweg 30 W-2107 Rosengarten / DE | [1992/25] | Application number, filing date | 91119842.2 | 21.11.1991 | [1992/25] | Priority number, date | DE19904039636 | 12.12.1990 Original published format: DE 4039636 | [1992/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0490136 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0490136 | Date: | 20.01.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/03] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0490136 | Date: | 03.05.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C09J161/04, C09J161/06, C08K3/00, F16D69/00 | [1993/03] | CPC: |
F16D69/04 (EP,US);
C08G8/00 (EP,US);
C09J161/04 (EP,US);
F16D2069/0475 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/25] | C09J161/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1992/25] | Title | German: | Heisshärtbarer Klebstoff | [1992/25] | English: | Hot setting adhesive | [1992/25] | French: | Adhésif thermodurcissable | [1992/25] | Examination procedure | 12.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/05] | 10.03.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 06.02.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP58029850 ; | [A]JP59108072 ; | [A]JP53061645 ; | [X]US4216133 (CRAIG ROBERT S [US], et al); | [Y]US4539343 (NISHIMURA TOSHIAKI [JP]); | [Y]US4268657 (MANZARA ANTHONY P); | [A]US3910857 (PHILLIPS WARREN G) | [Y] - File supplier PAJ/JPO & JP-A-58 029 850 (Matsuhita Denko) 22/2 83, & JP58029850 A 00000000 | [A] - Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 84-191797 & JP-A-59 108 072 (NITTO ELECTRIC) 22. Juni 1984, & JP59108072 A 00000000 | [A] - Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 78-50377A & JP-A-53 061 645 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC) 2. Juni 1978, & JP53061645 A 00000000 |