EP0488433 - Regulating needle for a duct transporting dust-containing hot gases [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.10.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 15 01 60015 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/23] | For all designated states METALLGESELLSCHAFT Aktiengesellschaft Postfach 10 15 01, Reuterweg 14 D-60015 Frankfurt / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Frank, Wolfgang Egerlandstrasse 6 W-6236 Eschborn / DE | 02 /
Löffler, Johannes, Dr. Paul-Andrich-Weg 3 W-6380 Bad Homburg / DE | 03 /
Holle, Norbert Hardtwaldallee 18 W-6382 Friedrichsdorf 4 / DE | [1992/23] | Application number, filing date | 91202540.0 | 01.10.1991 | [1992/23] | Priority number, date | DE19904036487 | 16.11.1990 Original published format: DE 4036487 | [1992/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0488433 | Date: | 03.06.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0488433 | Date: | 20.12.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.02.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C21B9/12, F16K49/00 | [1992/23] | CPC: |
C21B7/002 (EP,US);
F16K49/005 (EP,US);
F27D7/00 (EP,US);
Y10T137/6579 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, CH, DE, IT, LI [1995/51] |
Former [1992/23] | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Regelspiess für einen staubhaltige, heisse Gase führenden Kanal | [1992/23] | English: | Regulating needle for a duct transporting dust-containing hot gases | [1992/23] | French: | Pointeau de réglage pour canal transportant du gaz poussiéreux et chaud | [1992/23] | Examination procedure | 11.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 17.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 21.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 02.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB940007 (HUETTENWERK OBERHAUSEN AG); | [A]US3259143 (POWELL RUSSELL A, et al) | Examination | DE635739 | DE2364385 |