EP0444784 - Suture coated with a polyvinyl ester [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.07.1996 [1996/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | For all designated states ETHICON INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bezwada, Rao S. 1 Nevius Road Whitehouse Station NJ 08889 / US | 02 /
Hunter, Alastair W. 516 Spring Valley Drive Bridgewater, NJ 08807 / US | [1991/36] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/36] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 91300783.7 | 31.01.1991 | [1991/36] | Priority number, date | US19900473505 | 01.02.1990 Original published format: US 473505 | [1991/36] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0444784 | Date: | 04.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/36] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0444784 | Date: | 12.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61L17/00 | [1991/36] | CPC: |
A61L17/145 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1991/36] | Title | German: | Mit Polyvinylester überzogenes Nahtmaterial | [1991/36] | English: | Suture coated with a polyvinyl ester | [1991/36] | French: | Suture revêtue d'un ester polyvinylique | [1991/36] | Examination procedure | 11.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/15] | 20.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 19.07.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.01.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2297051 (ETHICON INC [US]) |