Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0449413
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
23.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] |
17.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
25.10.1996 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 11.12.1996 [1996/50] |
30.08.1996 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.1996 [1996/42] |
21.06.1996 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.08.1996 [1996/32] |
03.11.1995 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 20.12.1995 [1995/51] |
25.10.1994 |
Change - representative |
published on 14.12.1994 [1994/50] |
25.08.1994 |
First examination report |
|
11.02.1992 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 01.04.1992 [1992/14] |
15.08.1991 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 02.10.1991 [1991/40] |