EP0445982 - Hair-care composition and methods of treating hair [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.11.1994 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 18.01.1995 [1995/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Dow Corning Corporation 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland, Michigan 48686-0994 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | For all designated states DOW CORNING CORPORATION 3901 S. Saginaw Road Midland Michigan 48686-0994 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Lamb, Joann 1207 North Parkway Midland, Michigan / US | 02 /
Dillon, Kathy Lee 3035 Crestwood Court Bay City, Michigan / US | [1991/37] | Representative(s) | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/37] | Lewin, John Harvey, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 91301702.6 | 01.03.1991 | [1991/37] | Priority number, date | US19900487335 | 02.03.1990 Original published format: US 487335 | [1991/37] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0445982 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0445982 | Date: | 18.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0445982 | Date: | 26.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | A61K7/06 | [1991/37] | CPC: |
A61Q5/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/06 (EP,US);
A61K8/8182 (EP,US);
A61K8/891 (EP,US);
A61Q5/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1991/37] | Title | German: | Haarpflegemittel und Verfahren zur Haarpflege | [1991/37] | English: | Hair-care composition and methods of treating hair | [1991/37] | French: | Composition pour le soin des cheveux et méthodes de traitement des cheveux | [1991/37] | Examination procedure | 23.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 10.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 10.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/03] | Request for further processing for: | 10.05.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 10.05.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 27.05.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2826551 (GEEN HENRY C); | [Y]US3208911 (OPPLIGER PAUL E); | [A]US3562786 (BAILEY DONALD L, et al); | [YD]EP0356210 (DOW CORNING [US]); | [AP]EP0381318 (DOW CORNING [GB]) |