EP0451987 - In-furnace slag level measuring method and apparatus therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.07.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.09.1998 [1998/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NKK CORPORATION 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1991/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nagamune, Akio, c/o NKK Corporation 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 02 /
Tezuka, Kouichi, c/o NKK Corporation 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 03 /
Komine, Isamu, c/o NKK Corporation 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Kuriyama, Shinji, c/o NKK Corporation 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Komatani, Masaki, c/o NKK Corporation 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | 06 /
Inoue, Akihiko, c/o NKK Corporation 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [1997/37] |
Former [1991/42] | 01 /
Nagamune, Akio, c/o NKK Corporation 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
02 /
Tezuka, Kouichi, c/o NKK Corporation 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
03 /
Komine, Isamu, c/o NKK Corporation 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
04 /
Kiriyama, Shinji, c/o NKK Corporation 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
05 /
Komatani, Masaki, c/o NKK Corporation 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | |||
06 /
Inoue, Akihiko, c/o NKK Corporation 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Representative(s) | Watkins, David, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 30 Welbeck Street London W1G 8ER / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/26] | Watkins, David, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord, 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1994/26] | Wood, Anthony Charles Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 91 Wimpole Street London W1M 8AH / GB | ||
Former [1991/45] | Gregory, Timothy Mark Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Midsummer House 411C Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keynes MK9 3BN / GB | ||
Former [1991/42] | Marsh, Roy David Urquhart-Dykes & Lord Midsummer House 411C Midsummer Boulevard Central Milton Keynes MK9 3BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 91302653.0 | 26.03.1991 | [1991/42] | Priority number, date | JP19900081312 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: JP 8131290 | JP19900081313 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: JP 8131390 | JP19900081314 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: JP 8131490 | [1991/42] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0451987 | Date: | 16.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/42] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0451987 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0451987 | Date: | 10.09.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01S13/32, G01S13/88, G01F23/28, C21C5/46 | [1992/49] | CPC: |
C21C5/4673 (EP,US);
G01F23/28 (KR);
G01F23/284 (EP,US);
G01S13/325 (EP,US);
G01S13/88 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1991/42] | G01S13/88 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1992/48] |
Former [1991/42] | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zur Schlackenniveaumessung in einem Ofen | [1991/42] | English: | In-furnace slag level measuring method and apparatus therefor | [1991/42] | French: | Méthode et appareil pour mesurer le niveau de scorie dans un four | [1991/42] | Examination procedure | 23.02.1993 | Examination requested [1993/16] | 03.01.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 06.07.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.01.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 16.03.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.03.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.06.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.03.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.03.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 20.03.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.03.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP63161111 ; | [A]LU74321 ; | [A]EP0156375 (HONEYWELL INC [US]); | [A]EP0258929 (HOOGOVENS GROEP BV [NL]); | [A]EP0262989 (CANADIAN CORPORATE MANAGEMENT [CA]); | [A]US4758839 (GOEBEL ROBERT H [US], et al); | [Y]EP0280349 (HOOGOVENS GROEP BV [NL]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 433 (C-543)15 November 1988 & JP-A-63 161 111 ( N K K CORP. ) 4 July 1988, & JP63161111 A 19880704 |