Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
19.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.1997 [1997/45] |
04.07.1997 | Surcharge for renewal fee | |
28.05.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | |
09.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant a patent | |
15.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant | |
27.04.1996 | Renewal fee | |
23.01.1996 | Examination report or reply | |
09.08.1993 | First examination report | |
11.10.1991 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 27.11.1991 [1991/48] |
11.10.1991 | Request for examination filed | published on 27.11.1991 [1991/48] |