Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0458691 | Global Dossier | 27.11.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9006444 | 23.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | FR2662395 | 13.01.1995 | B1 | FR2662395 | 29.11.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | FR9006444 | 23.05.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5196865 | 23.03.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | FR9006444 | 23.05.1990 |