EP0458691 - Improvement in thermal printheads [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 05.11.1997 [1997/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AXIOHM 1 à 9 rue d'Arcueil F-92120 Montrouge / FR | [1991/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Morelle, Claude 3 Allée des Mouille Boeufs F-92290 Chatenay Malabry / FR | 02 /
Mouchet, Bernard 12 Allée de Fontainebleau F-75019 Paris / FR | [1991/48] | Representative(s) | Robert, Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Boettcher 16, rue Médéric 75017 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1991/48] | Robert, Jean-Pierre, et al CABINET BOETTCHER 23, rue la Boétie F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 91401300.8 | 21.05.1991 | [1991/48] | Priority number, date | FR19900006444 | 23.05.1990 Original published format: FR 9006444 | [1991/48] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0458691 | Date: | 27.11.1991 | Language: | FR | [1991/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/335, B41J2/375 | [1991/48] | CPC: |
B41J2/3357 (EP,US);
B41J2/375 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, SE [1991/48] | Title | German: | Verbesserung für thermische Druckknöpfe | [1991/48] | English: | Improvement in thermal printheads | [1991/48] | French: | Perfectionnement aux têtes thermiques d'imprimantes | [1991/48] | Examination procedure | 22.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/48] | 12.08.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 13.01.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.04.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/45] | 02.06.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.05.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.04.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.05.1997 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP55144178 ; | [Y]JP56142081 ; | [A]JP61255872 ; | [Y]JP62199471 ; | [X]US4837586 (BROWNSTEIN SCOTT A [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 5, no. 14 (M-52)(686), 28 janvier 1981; & JP - A - 55144178 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.) 10.11.1980, & JP55144178 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 6, no. 23 (M-111)(901), 10 février 1982; & JP - A - 56142081 (RICOH K.K.) 06.11.1981, & JP56142081 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 111 (M-578)(2558), 8 avril 1987; & JP - A - 61255872 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND. CO. LTD.) 13.11.1986, & JP61255872 A 00000000 | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 52 (M-668)(2899), 17 février 1988; & JP - A - 62199471 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.) 03.09.1987, & JP62199471 A 00000000 |