Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
03.05.2002 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
03.09.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
26.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.12.1995 [1995/50] |
13.10.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 06.12.1995 [1995/49] |
04.11.1994 | (Expected) grant | published on 21.12.1994 [1994/51] |
18.05.1994 | First examination report | |
21.02.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 08.04.1992 [1992/15] |
21.02.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 08.04.1992 [1992/15] |