EP0479633 - Method and apparatus for supplying gas to an analyser with a very high sensitivity [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.10.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | For all designated states L'AIR LIQUIDE, SOCIETE ANONYME POUR L'ETUDE ET L'EXPLOITATION DES PROCEDES GEORGES CLAUDE 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Molozay, Maurice 1, allée des Charpentiers F-78320 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | 02 /
Loiseau, Gérard 4, rue Robespierre F-78390 Bois d'Arcy / FR | 03 /
Ronge, Catherine 13, rue de l'Espérance F-75013 Paris / FR | [1992/15] | Representative(s) | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'étude et l'exploitation des procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay 75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/15] | Le Moenner, Gabriel, et al L'AIR LIQUIDE, Société Anonyme pour l'étude et l'exploitation des procédés Georges Claude 75, Quai d'Orsay F-75321 Paris Cédex 07 / FR | Application number, filing date | 91402432.8 | 13.09.1991 | [1992/15] | Priority number, date | FR19900012101 | 02.10.1990 Original published format: FR 9012101 | [1992/15] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0479633 | Date: | 08.04.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0479633 | Date: | 21.12.1994 | Language: | FR | [1994/51] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.01.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G01N33/00 | [1992/15] | CPC: |
G01N1/22 (KR);
G01N33/0006 (EP,US);
G01N33/0018 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, GB, IT, NL [1992/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Lieferung von einem Gas an einen sehr empfindlichen Analysator | [1992/15] | English: | Method and apparatus for supplying gas to an analyser with a very high sensitivity | [1992/15] | French: | Procédé et dispositif de fourniture de gaz à un analyseur à très haute sensibilité | [1992/15] | Examination procedure | 18.09.1991 | Examination requested [1992/15] | 24.05.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 15.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 21.12.1994 | IT | 21.12.1994 | NL | 21.12.1994 | [2008/02] |
Former [2002/25] | ES | 21.12.1994 | |
IT | 21.12.1994 | ||
NL | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 21.12.1994 | |
NL | 21.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/49] | NL | 21.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0370871 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]); | [A]EP0370151 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]); | [A]FR2093653 (AVL AG); | [A]US4063446 (FUHRMANN HANS); | [A]US4436699 (NARATO KIYOSHI [JP], et al) |