Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0521939
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
17.02.2006 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
28.12.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
03.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
17.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
01.11.1996 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.12.1996 [1996/51] |
13.09.1996 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.10.1996 [1996/44] |
30.08.1996 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.10.1996 [1996/42] |
14.06.1996 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 31.07.1996 [1996/31] |
10.11.1995 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 27.12.1995 [1995/52] |
12.11.1993 |
First examination report |
|
27.11.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 13.01.1993 [1993/02] |
27.11.1992 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 13.01.1993 [1993/02] |