Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU652148B | Global Dossier | 18.08.1994 | B2 | AU7543691 | 30.10.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | GB9007146 | 30.03.1990 | GB9100477 | 28.03.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0521939 | Global Dossier | 27.12.1995 | B1 | EP0521939 | 13.01.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9007146 | 30.03.1990 | GB9100477 | 28.03.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69115897D1 | 08.02.1996 | D1 | Priority number | Date | GB9007146 | 30.03.1990 | GB9100477 | 28.03.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9115402 | Global Dossier | 17.10.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9007146 | 30.03.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2078991 | 01.10.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB9007146 | 30.03.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB2242393 | 08.09.1993 | B | GB2242393 | 02.10.1991 | A | GB9007146D0 | 30.05.1990 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB9007146 | 30.03.1990 |