EP0521939 - BAG HOLDING AND SEALING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HOLDCOURT LIMITED P1/125 Parl Road London NW8 7JS / GB | [1993/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LAMBERT, John, Michael P1/125 Park Road London NW8 7JS / GB | [1993/02] | Representative(s) | Lightfoot, Robert Oscar, et al c/o Dr. Walther Wolff & Co., 6 Buckingham Gate London SW1E 6JP / GB | [1993/02] | Application number, filing date | 91906408.9 | 28.03.1991 | [1993/02] | WO1991GB00477 | Priority number, date | GB19900007146 | 30.03.1990 Original published format: GB 9007146 | [1993/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9115402 | Date: | 17.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0521939 | Date: | 13.01.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.10.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0521939 | Date: | 27.12.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.10.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B65B67/12 | [1993/02] | CPC: |
B65B67/1244 (EP);
B65B2067/1283 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GR, IT, NL [1993/02] | Title | German: | BEUTELHALTE- UND -SCHWEISSVORRICHTUNG | [1993/02] | English: | BAG HOLDING AND SEALING UNIT | [1993/02] | French: | UNITE DE MAINTIEN ET DE FERMETURE DE SACS | [1993/02] | Entry into regional phase | 19.10.1992 | National basic fee paid | 19.10.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.10.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.10.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: GB | 19.10.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 19.11.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 28.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.09.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.03.1993 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.09.1993 | 31.03.1994 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   28.09.1994 | 31.03.1995 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   22.09.1995 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.12.1995 | ES | 27.12.1995 | FR | 27.12.1995 | GR | 27.12.1995 | NL | 27.12.1995 | DE | 28.03.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | BE | 27.12.1995 | |
ES | 27.12.1995 | ||
GR | 27.12.1995 | ||
NL | 27.12.1995 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [2002/25] | BE | 27.12.1995 | |
ES | 27.12.1995 | ||
GR | 27.12.1995 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [2000/05] | BE | 27.12.1995 | |
GR | 27.12.1995 | ||
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/44] | BE | 27.12.1995 | |
DE | 28.03.1996 | ||
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/42] | BE | 27.12.1995 | |
FR | 24.05.1996 | ||
Former [1996/31] | BE | 27.12.1995 | Cited in | International search | CH538401 [ ]; | FR2198872 [ ]; | FR1580334 [ ]; | DE2413065 [ ]; | FR2036310 [ ] |