Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
12.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.01.1995 [1995/01] |
26.11.1993 | (Expected) grant | published on 12.01.1994 [1994/02] |
27.11.1992 | First examination report | |
14.02.1992 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 01.04.1992 [1992/14] |
14.02.1992 | Request for examination filed | published on 01.04.1992 [1992/14] |