Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP3193041B | Global Dossier | 30.07.2001 | B2 | JPH05500674 | 12.02.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9100689 | 09.04.1991 | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE99927T | 15.01.1994 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP9100689 | 09.04.1991 | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2058946 | 20.11.2001 | C | CA2058946 | 18.10.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP9100689 | 09.04.1991 | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69100991T | 05.05.1994 | T2 | DE69100991D1 | 24.02.1994 | D1 | Priority number | Date | EP9100689 | 09.04.1991 | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK12495 | 03.02.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9100689 | 09.04.1991 | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR0164863B | 15.01.1999 | B1 | KR920702618 | 06.10.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9100689 | 09.04.1991 | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | RU2085190 | 27.07.1997 | C1 | Priority number | Date | EP9100689 | 09.04.1991 | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5409711 | 25.04.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | EP9100689 | 09.04.1991 | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9116043 | Global Dossier | 31.10.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU635133B | Global Dossier | 11.03.1993 | B2 | AU7681291 | 11.11.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0477333 | Global Dossier | 12.01.1994 | B1 | EP0477333 | 01.04.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK0477333T | 14.03.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2048594T | 16.03.1994 | T3 | Priority number | Date | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IE64274 | 26.07.1995 | B1 | IE911272 | 23.10.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | IT1246383 | 18.11.1994 | B | IT9020055 | 17.10.1991 | A1 | Priority number | Date | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | NZ237824 | 26.03.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT97369 | 31.08.1998 | B | PT97369 | 31.12.1991 | A | Priority number | Date | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | SA99191025 | 03.12.2005 | A | Priority number | Date | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA912793 | 30.12.1992 | B | Priority number | Date | IT2005590 | 17.04.1990 |