EP0530210 - TOUGHENED POLYAMIDES WITH SHORT CYCLE TIMES IN INJECTION MOLDING [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1993/10] | FAST CYCLING BLENDED POLYMER MATERIAL COMPRISING NYLON-6 | ||
[1994/48] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 30.09.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.11.1995 [1995/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road P.O. Box 2245 Morristown NJ 07962-2245 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/09] | For all designated states AlliedSignal Inc. 101 Columbia Road, P.O. Box 2245 Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [1993/18] | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL INC. (a Delaware corp.) Law Department P.O. Box 2245R Morristown, New Jersey 07962-2245 / US | ||
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states ALLIED-SIGNAL AUTOMOTIVE OF CANADA INC. P.O. Box 2245R Morristown, NJ 07962-2245 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GERVASI, Jay, A. 3 Grover Street Succasunna, NJ 07876 / US | 02 /
TULLER, Harold, W. Jones Lane Long Valley, NJ 07853 / US | 03 /
SMITH, Wesley, F. 3 Brittany Road Succasunna, NJ 07876 / US | 04 /
ALPAUGH, Charles, W. 181 Eyland Avenue Succasunna, NJ 07876 / US | [1993/10] | Representative(s) | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | Brock, Peter William, et al Urquhart-Dykes & Lord 1 Richfield Place Richfield Avenue Reading RG1 8EQ Berkshire / GB | Application number, filing date | 91907917.8 | 15.04.1991 | [1993/10] | WO1991US02565 | Priority number, date | US19900526271 | 21.05.1990 Original published format: US 526271 | [1993/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO9118053 | Date: | 28.11.1991 | [1991/27] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0530210 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 28.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0530210 | Date: | 30.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 01.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | C08L77/00 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
C08L77/00 (EP);
C08L51/06 (EP);
C08L2205/02 (EP);
C08L2205/035 (EP);
C08L23/0876 (EP);
C08L25/08 (EP);
C08L91/08 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L51/06, C08L2666/14 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/04 (EP);
C08L77/00, C08L2666/24 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/10] | Title | German: | SCHLAGFESTE POLYAMID MISCHUNG MIT KURZEN ZYKLUSZEITEN IM SPRITZGUSS | [1994/48] | English: | TOUGHENED POLYAMIDES WITH SHORT CYCLE TIMES IN INJECTION MOLDING | [1994/48] | French: | POLYAMIDES RESISTANT AU CHOC AVEC CYCLES DE MOULAGE RAPIDES | [1994/48] |
Former [1993/10] | SCHNELL RINGBILDENDE POLYMERMISCHUNG NYLON-6 ENTHALTEND | ||
Former [1993/10] | FAST CYCLING BLENDED POLYMER MATERIAL COMPRISING NYLON-6 | ||
Former [1993/10] | MATIERES POLYMERES MELANGEES A CYCLES DE MOULAGE RAPIDES COMPRENANT DU NYLON-6 | Entry into regional phase | 05.11.1992 | National basic fee paid | 05.11.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.11.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.09.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 05.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 14.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 12.04.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 21.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 16.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 05.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1403797 (ICI LTD); | [Y]EP0284379 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO [JP]); | [A]US4814379 (FLOOD PAUL W [US], et al) |