EP0530226 - METHOD FOR REMOVING NITROGEN FROM AN AQUEOUS SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 26.08.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AKVA GAD A/S Agenavej 31-33 DK-2670 Greve Strand / DK | For all designated states Jörgensen, S.E., Prof. Langkaer Vaenge 9 DK-3500 Vaerlöse / DK | For all designated states Halling-Sorensen, Bent Amager Faelledvej 9, 5th. DK-2300 Kobenhavn / DK | For all designated states Hjuler, Henning Avej 6 DK-2990 Nivá / DK | [1993/43] |
Former [1993/10] | For all designated states AKVA GAD A/S Agenavej 31-33 DK-2670 Greve Strand / DK | ||
For all designated states Jörgensen, S.E., Prof. Langkaer Vaenge 9 DK-3500 Vaerlöse / DK | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JORGENSEN, Svend, Erik Langkaer Vaenge 9 DK-3500 V rlose / DK | 02 /
POULSEN, Karsten Dronningholmsvej 8 DK-9600 Aars / DK | 03 /
HJULER, Henning Prss. Charlottesgade 57 DK-2200 Kobenhavn N / DK | 04 /
HALLING-SORENSEN, Bent Amager FAELLEDVEJ 9, 5 th. DK-2300 Kobenhavn S / DK | [1993/10] | Representative(s) | Holtzer, Merete Byrch, et al Zacco Denmark A/S Hans Bekkevolds Allé 7 2900 Hellerup / DK | [N/P] |
Former [1993/10] | Holtzer, Merete Byrch, et al c/o Lehmann & Ree A/S Grundtvigsvej 37 DK-1864 Frederiksberg C / DK | Application number, filing date | 91908994.6 | 25.04.1991 | [1993/10] | WO1991DK00111 | Priority number, date | DK19900001125 | 07.05.1990 Original published format: DK 112590 | [1993/10] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9117123 | Date: | 14.11.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0530226 | Date: | 10.03.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.11.1991 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/10] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0530226 | Date: | 26.10.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SE | 14.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C02F3/30 | [1993/10] | CPC: |
C02F3/34 (EP,US);
C02F3/06 (EP,US);
C02F3/10 (EP,US);
C02F3/2806 (EP,US);
C02F3/302 (EP,US);
Y02W10/10 (EP,US);
Y10S210/903 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1993/10] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM ENTFERNEN VON STICKSTOFF AUS EINER WÄSSRIGEN LÖSUNG | [1993/10] | English: | METHOD FOR REMOVING NITROGEN FROM AN AQUEOUS SOLUTION | [1993/10] | French: | PROCEDE DE SUPPRESSION DE L'AZOTE D'UNE SOLUTION AQUEUSE | [1993/10] | Entry into regional phase | 09.12.1992 | National basic fee paid | 09.12.1992 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.12.1992 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.12.1991 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 09.12.1992 | Examination requested [1993/10] | 27.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 28.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.07.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.04.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 26.10.1994 | BE | 26.10.1994 | ES | 26.10.1994 | FR | 26.10.1994 | GR | 26.10.1994 | IT | 26.10.1994 | NL | 26.10.1994 | SE | 26.01.1995 | LU | 30.04.1995 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/25] | AT | 26.10.1994 | |
BE | 26.10.1994 | ||
ES | 26.10.1994 | ||
GR | 26.10.1994 | ||
IT | 26.10.1994 | ||
NL | 26.10.1994 | ||
SE | 26.01.1995 | ||
FR | 24.03.1995 | ||
LU | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [2000/05] | AT | 26.10.1994 | |
BE | 26.10.1994 | ||
GR | 26.10.1994 | ||
IT | 26.10.1994 | ||
NL | 26.10.1994 | ||
SE | 26.01.1995 | ||
FR | 24.03.1995 | ||
LU | 30.04.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 26.10.1994 | |
BE | 26.10.1994 | ||
IT | 26.10.1994 | ||
NL | 26.10.1994 | ||
SE | 26.01.1995 | ||
FR | 24.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/36] | AT | 26.10.1994 | |
BE | 26.10.1994 | ||
NL | 26.10.1994 | ||
SE | 26.01.1995 | ||
FR | 24.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | AT | 26.10.1994 | |
BE | 26.10.1994 | ||
NL | 26.10.1994 | ||
SE | 26.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/30] | AT | 26.10.1994 | |
BE | 26.10.1994 | ||
SE | 26.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 26.10.1994 | |
SE | 26.01.1995 | Cited in | International search | [Y]GB1584373 (BESIK F); | [Y]US4370234 (MARSLAND WILLIAM P [US]); | [A]EP0173340 (INT MINERALS & CHEM CORP [US]); | [Y]DE3639153 (SCHOTT GLASWERKE [DE]); | [A]DE3724027 (BOCK EBERHARD [DE]); | [A]DE3810564 (KERNFORSCHUNGSANLAGE JUELICH [DE]) |