23.07.2004 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.09.2004 [2004/37] |
28.12.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
23.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] |
17.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.02.2000 [2000/05] |
14.08.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.09.1998 [1998/40] |
05.06.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.1998 [1998/30] |
23.01.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.1998 [1998/11] |
28.11.1997 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 14.01.1998 [1998/03] |
17.10.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.1997 [1997/49] |
06.12.1996 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] |
19.10.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
17.07.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
31.05.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
27.03.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant |
|
09.03.1995 |
First examination report |
|
27.05.1993 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 14.07.1993 [1993/28] |
24.04.1993 |
Change - classification |
published on 16.06.1993 [1993/24] |
29.01.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] |
29.01.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 17.03.1993 [1993/11] |