EP0498215 - Apparatus and method for joining elastomeric sheet material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.11.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 27.12.1996 [1996/52] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states UNIROYAL GOODRICH LICENSING SERVICES, INC. 517 Michelin Road Greenville South Carolina 29605 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/50] | For all designated states Uniroyal Goodrich Licensing Services, Inc. 517 Michelin Road Greenville, South Carolina 29605 / US | ||
Former [1992/33] | For all designated states The Uniroyal Goodrich Tire Company 600 South Main Street Akron Ohio 44397-0001 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Tokita, Noboru 27 Rock Hill Road Woodbridge, Connecticut 06525 / US | 02 /
Lindquist, John R 63 Castel Boulevard Akron, Ohio 44313 / US | [1992/33] | Representative(s) | Devaux, Edmond-Yves Michelin & Cie, Service SGD/LG/PI Ladoux 63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cedex 01 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | Devaux, Edmond-Yves Michelin & Cie Service SRK. Brevets 23, Place des Carmes F-63040 Clermont-Ferrand Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92101010.4 | 22.01.1992 | [1992/33] | Priority number, date | US19910651174 | 06.02.1991 Original published format: US 651174 | [1992/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0498215 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0498215 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0498215 | Date: | 03.01.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B29C65/00, B29D30/42, B29C55/06, // B29K21:00, B29K105:08 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
B29D30/42 (EP,US);
B29C65/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/1122 (EP,US);
B29C66/43 (EP,US);
B29C66/71 (EP,US);
B29C66/72141 (EP,US);
B29C66/81417 (EP,US);
B29C66/81431 (EP,US);
B29C66/8322 (EP,US);
B29C66/8362 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212 (EP,US);
B29D2030/423 (EP,US);
B29D2030/427 (EP,US);
B29D2030/428 (EP,US);
B29K2021/00 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
B29C66/71, B29K2021/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212, B29K2267/00 (EP,US);
B29C66/7212, B29K2277/00 (US,EP);
B29C66/7212, B29K2277/10 (US,EP); | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU [1992/33] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zum Verbinden von Bahnen aus Elastomermaterial | [1992/33] | English: | Apparatus and method for joining elastomeric sheet material | [1992/33] | French: | Dispositif et procédé pour la jonction de bandes en matériau élastomère | [1992/33] | Examination procedure | 22.01.1992 | Examination requested [1992/33] | 23.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 08.06.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.06.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 06.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.10.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 03.01.1996 | [1996/42] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1491065 (RANDALL CHESTER J); | [A]DE1177813 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG); | [A]DE1579213 (CONTINENTAL GUMMI WERKE AG); | [A]FR2207010 (SEMPERIT AG [AT]); | [AD]EP0406821 (UNIROYAL GOODRICH TIRE CO [US]) |