07.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
10.07.2004 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 25.08.2004 [2004/35] |
03.05.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.06.2002 [2002/25] |
23.12.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.02.2000 [2000/06] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
19.10.1995 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 06.12.1995 [1995/49] |
12.09.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.11.1995 [1995/44] |
25.08.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.10.1995 [1995/42] |
22.08.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.10.1995 [1995/41] |
12.07.1995 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 30.08.1995 [1995/35] |
28.10.1994 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 14.12.1994 [1994/50] |
18.05.1994 |
Change - representative |
published on 06.07.1994 [1994/27] |
22.01.1994 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.03.1994 [1994/11] |
29.06.1993 |
First examination report |
|
30.04.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 23.06.1993 [1993/25] |
29.01.1993 |
Publication of search report |
published on 24.03.1993 [1993/12] |
26.06.1992 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 12.08.1992 [1992/33] |