Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0498235 | Global Dossier | 14.12.1994 | B1 | EP0498235 | 24.03.1993 | A3 | EP0498235 | 12.08.1992 | A2 | Priority number | Date | DE9101314 | 06.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59200926D1 | 26.01.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE9101314 | 06.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE9101314U | 25.04.1991 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE9101314 | 06.02.1991 |