EP0498235 - Coupling with perforated membrane [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ROTAN GmbH Schultenhofstrasse 22 45475 Mülheim / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/33] | For all designated states ROTAN GmbH Schultenhofstrasse 22 D-45475 Mülheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hoppe, Rainer, Dr.-Ing. Monstadtstrasse 32 W-4630 Bochum 6 / DE | [1992/33] | Representative(s) | Cohausz Hannig Borkowski Wissgott Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei Schumannstrasse 97-99 40237 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/27] | COHAUSZ HASE DAWIDOWICZ & PARTNER Patentanwälte Schumannstrasse 97-99 D-40237 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1994/11] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [1992/33] | Cohausz & Florack Patentanwälte Postfach 33 02 29 D-40435 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 92101163.1 | 24.01.1992 | [1992/33] | Priority number, date | DE19910001314U | 06.02.1991 Original published format: DE 9101314 U | [1992/33] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0498235 | Date: | 12.08.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0498235 | Date: | 24.03.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/12] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0498235 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.02.1993 | Classification | IPC: | F16D3/77 | [1992/33] | CPC: |
F16D3/72 (EP);
F16D3/78 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL [1992/33] | Title | German: | Membrankupplungen mit druchbrochenen Konturmembranen | [1992/33] | English: | Coupling with perforated membrane | [1992/33] | French: | Accouplement à membrane ajourée | [1992/33] | Examination procedure | 08.01.1993 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 23.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/25] | 05.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1993 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 21.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.1994 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   16.07.1994 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 14.12.1994 | ES | 14.12.1994 | FR | 14.12.1994 | GB | 14.12.1994 | IT | 14.12.1994 | NL | 14.12.1994 | LU | 31.01.1995 | [2004/35] |
Former [2002/25] | BE | 14.12.1994 | |
ES | 14.12.1994 | ||
GB | 14.12.1994 | ||
IT | 14.12.1994 | ||
NL | 14.12.1994 | ||
LU | 31.01.1995 | ||
FR | 12.05.1995 | ||
Former [2000/06] | BE | 14.12.1994 | |
GB | 14.12.1994 | ||
IT | 14.12.1994 | ||
NL | 14.12.1994 | ||
LU | 31.01.1995 | ||
FR | 12.05.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 14.12.1994 | |
GB | 14.12.1994 | ||
IT | 14.12.1994 | ||
NL | 14.12.1994 | ||
FR | 12.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/44] | BE | 14.12.1994 | |
GB | 14.12.1994 | ||
NL | 14.12.1994 | ||
FR | 12.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/42] | BE | 14.12.1994 | |
NL | 14.12.1994 | ||
FR | 12.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/41] | NL | 14.12.1994 | |
FR | 12.05.1995 | ||
Former [1995/35] | NL | 14.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]DE8337492U ; | [X]US3041857 (ANDERSON JAMES H, et al); | [X]US4411634 (HAMMELMANN ROBERT W [US]); | [Y]EP0397314 (LUCAS AEROSPACE POWER TRANSMIS [US]); | [Y]US3677031 (ZIERAK STEPHEN J, et al); | [A]FR1021778 (HYDRAULIC COUPLING PATENTS LTD); | [A]FR446977 (ETS DE DION BOUTON [FR]); | [A]US3959988 (MCNAMEE ANTHONY); | [XP]DE9101314U |