EP0513592 - Bellows made of elastomeric material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.05.1995 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.05.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 05.07.1995 [1995/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 30165 Hannover / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1992/47] | For all designated states Continental Aktiengesellschaft Vahrenwalder Strasse 9 D-30165 Hannover / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmittmann, Heinrich Danzigerstrasse 3b W-3138 Dannenberg / DE | 02 /
Nouailles, Jean-Pierre Mendelsohnstrasse 7 W-3000 Hannover 1 / DE | [1992/47] | Application number, filing date | 92107355.7 | 30.04.1992 | [1992/47] | Priority number, date | DE19914115446 | 11.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4115446 | [1992/47] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0513592 | Date: | 19.11.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0513592 | Date: | 13.07.1994 | Language: | DE | [1994/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F16L51/02 | [1992/47] | CPC: |
F16J3/041 (EP);
F16L27/11 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | ES, FR, IT [1992/47] | Title | German: | Faltenbalg aus elastomerem Werkstoff | [1992/47] | English: | Bellows made of elastomeric material | [1992/47] | French: | Soufflet en matière élastomère | [1992/47] | Examination procedure | 05.11.1992 | Examination requested [1993/02] | 28.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 19.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.02.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 09.02.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.04.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE1082089 ; | [A]CH615261 |