Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2008119586 | Global Dossier | 22.05.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US93931507 | 13.11.2007 | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US17137993 | 21.12.1993 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH05200068 | Global Dossier | 10.08.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0761192 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2001 | B1 | EP0761192 | 26.03.1997 | A3 | EP0761192 | 12.03.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP92115510 | 10.09.1992 | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0761191 | Global Dossier | 04.04.2001 | B1 | EP0761191 | 26.03.1997 | A3 | EP0761191 | 12.03.1997 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP92115510 | 10.09.1992 | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0539703 | Global Dossier | 19.10.2005 | B2 | EP0539703 | 05.03.1997 | B1 | EP0539703 | 05.05.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0532002 | Global Dossier | 14.05.1997 | B1 | EP0532002 | 17.03.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU685822B | Global Dossier | 29.01.1998 | B2 | AU7295394 | 24.11.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU679095B | Global Dossier | 19.06.1997 | B2 | AU7295494 | 24.11.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU657993B | Global Dossier | 30.03.1995 | B2 | AU2350792 | 18.03.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9203512 | 13.04.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2076945 | 08.10.2002 | C | CA2076945 | 12.03.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69217817T | 05.10.2006 | T3 | DE69217817T | 14.08.1997 | T2 | DE69217817D1 | 10.04.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69219705T | 27.11.1997 | T2 | DE69219705D1 | 19.06.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69231774T | 22.11.2001 | T2 | DE69231774D1 | 10.05.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69231775T | 22.11.2001 | T2 | DE69231775D1 | 10.05.2001 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EG19584 | 29.06.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2097846T | 16.04.2006 | T5 | ES2097846T | 16.04.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2100991T | 01.07.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2155561T | 16.05.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2155562T | 16.05.2001 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1006393 | 26.02.1999 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100217829B | 01.09.1999 | B1 | KR930005637 | 20.04.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US90600192 | 26.06.1992 | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5509915 | 23.04.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US9665493 | 22.07.1993 | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH05261126 | Global Dossier | 12.10.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | JPH05245168 | Global Dossier | 24.09.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU658439B | Global Dossier | 13.04.1995 | B2 | AU2350992 | 25.03.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU656017B | Global Dossier | 19.01.1995 | B2 | AU2350892 | 18.03.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0532005 | Global Dossier | 05.12.2001 | B2 | EP0532005 | 27.11.1996 | B1 | EP0532005 | 17.03.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9203134 | 13.04.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | BR9203246 | 13.04.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2057694 | 28.05.2002 | C | CA2057694 | 12.03.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2060743 | 12.03.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2060744 | 29.01.2002 | C | CA2060744 | 12.03.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE69215465T | 02.10.2002 | T3 | DE69215465T | 27.03.1997 | T2 | DE69215465D1 | 09.01.1997 | D1 | Priority number | Date | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EG19718 | 30.08.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EG19802 | 31.05.1996 | A | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2094262T | 16.02.2002 | T5 | ES2094262T | 16.01.1997 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100217832B | 01.09.1999 | B1 | KR930005597 | 20.04.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR100230217B | 15.11.1999 | B1 | Priority number | Date | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9200645 | 31.03.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9200647 | 01.09.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | MX9200648 | 01.11.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | PH31629 | 12.01.1999 | A | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR28847 | 06.08.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5192606 | 09.03.1993 | A | Priority number | Date | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA92306 | 28.10.1992 | B | Priority number | Date | US75777891 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA92308 | 28.10.1992 | B | Priority number | Date | US75776091 | 11.09.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ZA926099 | 02.03.1993 | B | Priority number | Date | US75778791 | 11.09.1991 |