EP0532005 - Absorbent article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Patent maintained as amended Status updated on 19.10.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.03.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 18.04.2007 [2007/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, WI 54956 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1999/01] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK WORLDWIDE, INC. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
Former [1998/20] | For all designated states Kimberly-Clark Worldwide, Inc. 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956 / US | ||
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states KIMBERLY-CLARK CORPORATION 401 North Lake Street Neenah, Wisconsin 54956-0349 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Proxmire, Deborah Lynn 7915 County Hwy MM Larsen, Wisconsin 54947 / US | 02 /
Jackson, Wanda Walton 275 Greenmont Circle Alpharetta, Georgia 30201 / US | 03 /
Kollin, Nancy Donaldson 315 Woodchuck Court Roswell, Georgia, 30076 / US | 04 /
Mace, Tamara Lee 1113 Belmont Drive Alpharetta, Georgia 30202 / US | 05 /
McCormack, Ann Louise 2835 Stratfield Drive Cumming, Georgia 30130 / US | 06 /
Schlinz, Daniel Robert 318 Prairie View Drive Appleton, Wisconsin 54915 / US | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., et al Diehl & Partner GbR Postfach 34 01 15 80098 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Diehl, Hermann O. Th., Dr., et al Diehl, Glaeser, Hiltl & Partner Patentanwälte Postfach 19 03 65 D-80603 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92115518.0 | 10.09.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | US19910757778 | 11.09.1991 Original published format: US 757778 | [1993/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0532005 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0532005 | Date: | 27.11.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/48] | Type: | B2 New European patent specification | No.: | EP0532005 | Date: | 05.12.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.01.1993 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/15 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
A61F13/49009 (EP,US);
A61F13/51121 (EP,US);
A61F13/513 (EP,US);
A61F13/49 (EP,US);
A61F13/49011 (EP,US);
A61F13/491 (EP,US);
A61F13/49413 (EP,US);
A61F13/537 (EP,US);
A61F2013/15284 (EP,US);
A61F2013/49076 (EP,US);
A61F2013/49077 (EP,US);
A61F2013/4948 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51409 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51411 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51441 (EP,US);
A61F2013/51443 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530007 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530014 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530029 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530131 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530226 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530233 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53024 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530255 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530299 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530328 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530343 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53035 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530437 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530481 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530569 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530583 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530591 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530613 (EP,US);
A61F2013/5307 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530708 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530766 (EP,US);
A61F2013/530802 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53445 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53721 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53795 (EP,US);
A61F2013/53908 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1993/11] | Title | German: | Absorbierender Gegenstand | [1993/11] | English: | Absorbent article | [1993/11] | French: | Article absorbant | [1993/11] | Examination procedure | 10.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/45] | 14.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.03.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.06.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 12.06.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
27.08.1997
10.09.1997
ADMISSIBLE SCA Hygiene Products AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Romare, Laila Anette Zacco Sweden AB Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | 02
27.08.1997
10.09.1997
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Canonici, Jean-Jacques Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1999/46] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.08.1997
10.09.1997
ADMISSIBLE SCA HYGIENE PRODUCTS AB 405 03 Göteborg / SE Opponent's representative Romare, Laila Anette Albihns Patentbyra Göteborg AB P.O.Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | ||
02
27.08.1997
10.09.1997
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Canonici, Jean-Jacques Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH, Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | |||
Former [1997/43] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
27.08.1997
SCA MOLNLYCKE AB 405 03 Goteborg / SE Opponent's representative Romare, Laila Anette Albihns.Zacco Torggatan 8 Box 142 401 22 Göteborg / SE | ||
02
27.08.1997
ADMISSIBLE The Procter & Gamble Company One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OHIO 45202 / US Opponent's representative Canonici, Jean-Jacques Procter & Gamble European Service GmbH Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | 01.10.1997 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 30.03.1998 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.06.1998 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be revoked | 22.05.2001 | Legal effect of interlocutory decision in opposition | 05.07.2001 | Despatch of interlocutory decision in opposition | 17.07.2001 | Despatch of communication that the patent will be maintained as amended | 28.09.2001 | Fee for printing new specification paid | Appeal following opposition | 26.08.1998 | Appeal received No. T0905/98 | 26.10.1998 | Statement of grounds filed | 05.07.2001 | Interlocutory revision of appeal | 05.07.2001 | Result of appeal procedure: maintenance in amended form | 22.05.2001 | Date of oral proceedings | 30.05.2001 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 27.11.1996 | SE | 11.09.2001 | BE | 30.09.2001 | [2007/16] |
Former [2004/28] | NL | 27.11.1996 | |
SE | 11.09.2001 | ||
Former [2003/07] | NL | 27.11.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0439962 (CHICOPEE [US]); | [X]EP0359501 (JOHNSON & JOHNSON INC [CA]); | [Y]EP0173058 (KAO CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0070163 (CHICOPEE [US]); | [A]EP0422504 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) | by applicant | US3523536 | US3768118 | US3663348 | US4578070 | US4681577 | US4699619 | US4585448 | US4798603 | EP0254476 | US4834735 | US4673402 | US4704116 | US4753649 | US4296750 | US3902236 | US4076663 | US4286082 | US4900384 | Opposition | US3523536 | US3768118 | US3663348 | US4578070 | US4681577 | US4699619 | US4585448 | US4798603 | EP0254476 | US4834735 | US4673402 | US4704116 | US4753649 | US4296750 | US3902236 | US4076663 | US4286082 | US4900384 |