EP0548633 - Device for restraining a vehicle on a ramp [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.12.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 22.01.1997 [1997/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states VAN WIJK NEDERLAND B.V. Loodsweg 1 NL-8243 PH Lelystad / NL | [1993/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dores, Antonio Pereira das Archipel 36-09 NL-8224 HL Lelystad / NL | [1993/26] | Representative(s) | Beil, Hans Christoph, et al BEIL, WOLFF & BEIL Rechtsanwälte Postfach 80 01 40 65901 Frankfurt / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/26] | Beil, Hans Chr., Dr., et al BEIL, WOLFF & BEIL, Rechtsanwälte, Postfach 80 01 40 D-65901 Frankfurt / DE | Application number, filing date | 92120771.8 | 05.12.1992 | [1993/26] | Priority number, date | DE19910015804U | 20.12.1991 Original published format: DE 9115804 U | [1993/26] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0548633 | Date: | 30.06.1993 | Language: | DE | [1993/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0548633 | Date: | 31.01.1996 | [1996/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65G67/02 | [1993/26] | CPC: |
B65G69/003 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1993/26] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zum Festhalten eines Fahrzeuges an einer Rampe | [1993/26] | English: | Device for restraining a vehicle on a ramp | [1993/26] | French: | Dispositif pour retenir un véhicule à une rampe | [1993/26] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/48] | 24.04.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 12.05.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 01.11.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.11.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4964777 (KLEYNJANS JOSEPH P H [US], et al); | [A]US4861217 (ERLANDSSON KJELL I [US]); | [A]US4674941 (HAGEMAN MARTIN P [US]) |