EP0503772 - Electrical power generation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British Gas plc Rivermill House, 152 Grosvenor Road London SW1V 3JL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/38] | For all designated states British Gas plc Rivermill House 152 Grosvenor Road London SW1V 3JL / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hodrien, Ronald Christipher 47 Henley Crescent Solihull, West Midlands B91 2JD / GB | 02 /
Wild, Keith Robert 19 Chandlers Drive, Amington Tamworth, Staffordshire B77 4NY / GB | [1992/38] | Application number, filing date | 92301183.7 | 13.02.1992 | [1992/38] | Priority number, date | GB19910004716 | 06.03.1991 Original published format: GB 9104716 | [1992/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0503772 | Date: | 16.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/38] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0503772 | Date: | 25.11.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0503772 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.1992 | Classification | IPC: | F02C3/28, F02C3/20 | [1992/48] | CPC: |
F02C3/28 (EP,US);
Y02E20/16 (EP,US);
Y02T10/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1992/38] | F02C3/20 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, IT, NL, SE [1995/40] |
Former [1992/38] | AT, BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | Gewinnung elektrischer Energie | [1992/38] | English: | Electrical power generation | [1992/38] | French: | Production d'énergie électrique | [1992/38] | Examination procedure | 28.09.1992 | Examination requested [1992/50] | 02.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 20.02.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 24.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 20.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB2121426 (BRITISH GAS CORP); | [A]US4478039 (HORGAN JOHN J [US]); | [A]US4631915 (FREWER HANS [DE], et al); | [A]EP0284853 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |