Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5371819 | 06.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US13587693 | 12.10.1993 | US71382191 | 12.06.1991 | US83270692 | 07.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5371821 | 06.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US13545993 | 12.10.1993 | US71382191 | 12.06.1991 | US83270692 | 07.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5371827 | 06.12.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US13434093 | 12.10.1993 | US71382191 | 12.06.1991 | US83270692 | 07.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5444810 | 22.08.1995 | A | Priority number | Date | US13516693 | 12.10.1993 | US71382191 | 12.06.1991 | US83270692 | 07.02.1992 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5692090 | 25.11.1997 | A | Priority number | Date | US13516693 | 12.10.1993 | US34673294 | 30.11.1994 | US71382191 | 12.06.1991 | US83270692 | 07.02.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU654715B | Global Dossier | 17.11.1994 | B2 | AU1810892 | 17.12.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | US71382191 | 12.06.1991 | US83270692 | 07.02.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0518597 | Global Dossier | 28.04.1993 | A3 | EP0518597 | 16.12.1992 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US71382191 | 12.06.1991 | US83270692 | 07.02.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2066351 | 13.12.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US71382191 | 12.06.1991 | US83270692 | 07.02.1992 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US5315684 | 24.05.1994 | A | Priority number | Date | US71382191 | 12.06.1991 | US83270692 | 07.02.1992 |