EP0518597 - Fiber optic cable end connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 25.07.1997 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.07.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.09.1997 [1997/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JOHN MEZZALINGUA ASSOC. INC. One Mezzy Lane Manlius New York 13104 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | For all designated states JOHN MEZZALINGUA ASSOC. INC. One Mezzy Lane Manlius, New York 13104 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Szegda, Andrew R.R.5, Pheasant Run Canastota N.Y. 13032 / US | [1992/51] | Representative(s) | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1992/51] | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 92305236.9 | 08.06.1992 | [1992/51] | Priority number, date | US19910713821 | 12.06.1991 Original published format: US 713821 | US19920832706 | 07.02.1992 Original published format: US 832706 | [1992/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0518597 | Date: | 16.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/51] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0518597 | Date: | 28.04.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/36, G02B6/42, G02B6/38 | [1993/17] | CPC: |
G02B6/3897 (EP,US);
G02B6/4471 (US);
G02B6/4248 (EP,US);
G02B6/4277 (EP,US);
G02B6/4292 (EP,US);
G02B6/4416 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1992/51] | G02B6/36 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1992/51] | Title | German: | Faseroptischer Kabelabschlussstecker | [1992/51] | English: | Fiber optic cable end connector | [1992/51] | French: | Connecteur d'extrémité d'un câble optique | [1992/51] | Examination procedure | 13.10.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 19.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.11.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.1997 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/37] | 10.04.1997 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: fee for grant / fee for printing not paid in time [1997/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.05.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 05.04.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.06.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2096348 (ELLIOTT BROTHERS LONDON LTD); | [A]US4447120 (BORSUK LESLIE M [US]); | [A]WO8606472 (AMERICAN TELEPHONE & TELEGRAPH [US]); | [A]US4842364 (CHEN CHUNG F [US]); | [X]DE3813076 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [Y]WO9004799 (DU PONT [US]); | [Y]EP0405666 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) |