EP0532372 - Flexible workshop for assembling products [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 14.06.1995 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.1995 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.08.1995 [1995/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande Armée 75116 Paris / FR | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo 92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | For all designated states AUTOMOBILES PEUGEOT 75, Avenue de la Grande-Armée F-75116 Paris / FR | ||
For all designated states AUTOMOBILES CITROEN 62, Boulevard Victor Hugo F-92200 Neuilly-sur-Seine / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Guillon, Luc 17 Avenue du Général NIOX F-75016 Paris / FR | [1993/11] | Representative(s) | Robert, Jean-François PSA - PEUGEOT - CITROEN, Centre Technique CITROEN, Propriété Industrielle, Route de Gisy 78140 Velizy / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/11] | Robert, Jean-François PSA - PEUGEOT - CITROEN, Centre Technique CITROEN, Propriété Industrielle, Route de Gisy F-78140 Velizy / FR | Application number, filing date | 92402198.3 | 30.07.1992 | [1993/11] | Priority number, date | FR19910011400 | 11.09.1991 Original published format: FR 9111400 | [1993/11] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0532372 | Date: | 17.03.1993 | Language: | FR | [1993/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.12.1992 | Classification | IPC: | B25J5/00, B23P21/00 | [1993/11] | CPC: |
B23P21/004 (EP);
B25J19/005 (EP);
B25J5/007 (EP);
B23P2700/50 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, GB, IT [1993/11] | Title | German: | Flexible Werkstatt für die Montage von Werkstücken | [1993/11] | English: | Flexible workshop for assembling products | [1993/11] | French: | Atelier flexible de montage d'un produit | [1993/11] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 03.04.1993 | Examination requested [1993/22] | 14.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.06.1995 | Application withdrawn by applicant [1995/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0043208 ; | [Y]US4698775 ; | [Y]FR2598668 ; | [A]FR2548948 ; | [A]FR2322412 ; | [A]US4664590 ; | [A]DE3614165 ; | [A]GB2174686 ; | [A]EP0304942 | [Y] - WERKSTATTSTECHNIK, ZEITSCHRIFT FUR INDUSTRIELLE FERTIGUNG. vol. 73, no. 23, 1983, WURZBURG DE pages 161 - 164 WARNECKE 'fahrbare industreiroboter fur transport- und handhabungsaufgaben' |