EP0574584 - METHOD FOR PROVIDING A USER WITH A GAS SUPPLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.01.1999 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.01.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.03.1999 [1999/10] | Applicant(s) | For:AT
DE
GB
ZAKRYTOE AKTSIONERNOE OBSCHESTVO "BIOTEKHINVEST" Chernomorsky bulvar, 18-32 Moscow / RU | For:FR
NERUBIO INVESTMENTS B.V. Strawinskylaan 923 1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | [1998/19] |
Former [1997/29] | For:AT
DE
GB
NAUCHNO-PROIZVODSTVENNOE PREDPRIYATIE BIOTEKHINVEST ul. Bolshaya Polyanka, 11/14 Moscow, 109180 / RU | ||
For:FR
NERUBIO INVESTMENTS B.V. Strawinskylaan 923 1077 XX Amsterdam / NL | |||
Former [1995/31] | For:DE
GB
AT
NAUCHNO-PROIZVODSTVENNOE PREDPRIYATIE BIOTEKHINVEST ul. Bolshaya Polyanka, 11/14 Moscow, 109180 / RU | ||
For:FR
AKTSIONERNOE OBSCHESTVO ZAKRYTOGO TIPA "BIOTEKHINVEST" Chernomorsky bulvar, 18-32 Moscow, 113452 / RU | |||
Former [1993/51] | For all designated states NAUCHNO-PROIZVODSTVENNOE PREDPRIYATIE BIOTEKHINVEST ul. Bolshaya Polyanka, 11/14 Moscow, 109180 / RU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BELONENKO, Vladimir Nikolaevich p/o Razvilki, 10-6 Leninsky rayon Moskovskaya obl., 142717 / RU | 02 /
GABRIELYANTS, Michail Grigorievich ul. Udaltsova, 32-23 Moscow, 117454 / RU | [1993/51] | Representative(s) | Hirsch, Marc-Roger, et al Hirsch & Associés 58, Avenue Marceau 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1993/51] | Hirsch, Marc-Roger, et al Cabinet Hirsch 34 rue de Bassano F-75008 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 92904642.3 | 31.01.1992 | [1993/51] | WO1992RU00025 | Priority number, date | SU19914913858 | 06.03.1991 Original published format: SU 4913858 | [1993/51] | Filing language | RU | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215511 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | FR | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0574584 | Date: | 22.12.1993 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0574584 | Date: | 18.03.1998 | Language: | FR | [1998/12] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | SU | 17.09.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B65G5/00, E21B43/12, E21B43/18, E21B43/00, E21B43/24 | [1994/07] | CPC: |
E21B43/18 (EP,US);
B65G5/00 (EP,US);
E21B43/12 (EP,US);
E21B43/2401 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1993/51] | B65G5/00, E21B43/12, E21B43/18 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, FR, GB [1993/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR GASBELIEFERUNG EINES BENUTZERS | [1993/51] | English: | METHOD FOR PROVIDING A USER WITH A GAS SUPPLY | [1993/51] | French: | PROCEDE D'ALIMENTATION EN GAZ D'UN UTILISATEUR | [1993/51] | Entry into regional phase | 08.09.1993 | Translation filed | 06.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 06.09.1993 | Search fee paid | 06.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.10.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: FR | 08.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/51] | 25.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.01.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.05.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M05) | 22.10.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.06.1997 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 22.09.1997 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.12.1997 | Fee for grant paid | 23.12.1997 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 19.12.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1999/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.01.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 22.11.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed | International search | [A]FR2168942 (GAZ DE FRANCE [FR]); | [A]US4149596 (RICHARDSON JOSEPH G, et al); | [A]US4149598 (CHRISTIAN LAWRENCE D); | [A]US4444259 (SCHWALL JOSEPH A [US]); | [A]US4701072 (BEREZOUTZKY GEORGES [FR]) |