07.12.2007 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] |
17.02.2006 |
Change - lapse in a contracting state |
published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] |
28.12.2002 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 12.02.2003 [2003/07] |
03.09.1999 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 20.10.1999 [1999/42] |
20.02.1998 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.04.1998 [1998/15] |
30.05.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 16.07.1997 [1997/29] |
23.05.1997 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 09.07.1997 [1997/28] |
07.06.1996 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 24.07.1996 [1996/30] |
24.05.1996 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 10.07.1996 [1996/28] |
12.04.1996 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 29.05.1996 [1996/22] |
22.03.1996 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 08.05.1996 [1996/19] |
26.01.1996 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 13.03.1996 [1996/11] |
02.06.1995 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 19.07.1995 [1995/29] |
05.01.1994 |
Change - representative |
published on 23.02.1994 [1994/08] |
16.12.1993 |
Change - inventor |
published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] |
07.12.1993 |
First examination report |
|
22.10.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.12.1993 [1993/49] |
22.10.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.12.1993 [1993/49] |