Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP0572474 | Global Dossier | 19.07.1995 | B1 | EP0572474 | 08.12.1993 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4115515 | 11.05.1991 | EP9200381 | 22.02.1992 | DE4105789 | 23.02.1991 | DE9102166 | 23.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE4115515 | 27.08.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4115515 | 11.05.1991 | DE4105789 | 23.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE59202964D1 | 24.08.1995 | D1 | Priority number | Date | DE4115515 | 11.05.1991 | EP9200381 | 22.02.1992 | DE4105789 | 23.02.1991 | DE9102166 | 23.02.1991 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | DE9102166U | 16.05.1991 | U1 | Priority number | Date | DE9102166 | 23.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO9214410 | Global Dossier | 03.09.1992 | A1 | Priority number | Date | DE4115515 | 11.05.1991 | DE4105789 | 23.02.1991 | DE9102166 | 23.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU1245692 | Global Dossier | 15.09.1992 | A | Priority number | Date | DE4115515 | 11.05.1991 | DE4105789 | 23.02.1991 | DE9102166 | 23.02.1991 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE125134T | 15.08.1995 | T1 | Priority number | Date | DE4115515 | 11.05.1991 | DE4105789 | 23.02.1991 | DE9102166 | 23.02.1991 |