EP0572474 - CONSTRICTION DEVICE FOR REDUCING THE BLOOD FLOW IN PARTS OF THE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.1996 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 09.01.2008 [2008/02] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PRÄMETA Gesellschaft für Präzisionsmetall- und Kunststofferzeugnisse mbH & Co. KG Hardtgenbuscher Kirchweg 111 51107 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/49] | For all designated states PRÄMETA Gesellschaft für Präzisionsmetall- und Kunststofferzeugnisse mbH & Co. KG Hardtgenbuscher Kirchweg 111 D-51107 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIMON, Pal Gangelter Str. 25 D-52538 Gangelt-Hastenrath / DE | 02 /
WEHKING, Wolfgang Im Roggenfeld 16 D-5000 Köln 90 / DE | [1994/05] |
Former [1993/49] | 01 /
SIMON, Pal Brucknerweg 23 D-4788 Warstein / DE | ||
02 /
WEHKING, Wolfgang Im Roggenfeld 16 D-5000 Köln 90 / DE | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/08] | Dallmeyer, Georg, et al Patentanwälte von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | ||
Former [1993/49] | Dallmeyer, Georg Patentanwälte Von Kreisler-Selting-Werner Postfach 10 22 41 D-50462 Köln / DE | Application number, filing date | 92905065.6 | 22.02.1992 | [1993/49] | WO1992EP00381 | Priority number, date | DE19914105789 | 23.02.1991 Original published format: DE 4105789 | DE19910002166U | 23.02.1991 Original published format: DE 9102166 U | DE19914115515 | 11.05.1991 Original published format: DE 4115515 | [1993/49] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9214410 | Date: | 03.09.1992 | Language: | DE | [1992/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0572474 | Date: | 08.12.1993 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 03.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/49] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0572474 | Date: | 19.07.1995 | Language: | DE | [1995/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 03.09.1992 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12, A61M5/42 | [1993/49] | CPC: |
A61M5/425 (EP);
A61B17/1327 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1993/49] | Title | German: | ABSCHNÜRVORRICHTUNG FÜR KÖRPERTEILE | [1993/49] | English: | CONSTRICTION DEVICE FOR REDUCING THE BLOOD FLOW IN PARTS OF THE BODY | [1993/49] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE LIGATURE POUR PARTIES DU CORPS | [1993/49] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.1993 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.09.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 10.07.1993 | Examination requested [1993/49] | 09.12.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.04.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 08.06.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 20.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 19.07.1995 | DK | 19.07.1995 | FR | 19.07.1995 | GB | 19.07.1995 | IT | 19.07.1995 | NL | 19.07.1995 | SE | 19.10.1995 | AT | 22.02.1996 | CH | 29.02.1996 | LI | 29.02.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
DK | 19.07.1995 | ||
GB | 19.07.1995 | ||
IT | 19.07.1995 | ||
NL | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
AT | 22.02.1996 | ||
CH | 29.02.1996 | ||
LI | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
DK | 19.07.1995 | ||
GB | 19.07.1995 | ||
IT | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
AT | 22.02.1996 | ||
CH | 29.02.1996 | ||
LI | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1998/15] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
DK | 19.07.1995 | ||
GB | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
AT | 22.02.1996 | ||
CH | 29.02.1996 | ||
LI | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1997/29] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
GB | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
AT | 22.02.1996 | ||
CH | 29.02.1996 | ||
LI | 29.02.1996 | ||
Former [1997/28] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
GB | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
AT | 22.02.1996 | ||
Former [1996/30] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
GB | 19.07.1995 | ||
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/22] | BE | 19.07.1995 | |
SE | 19.10.1995 | ||
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/19] | SE | 19.10.1995 | |
FR | 15.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/11] | SE | 19.10.1995 | Cited in | International search | [A]DE366487 (MISCHA ZOLOTNITZKY, et al); | [X]US1824516 (TYVAND RAYMOND E); | [Y]US2234961 (CANADA PHOEBE L); | [A]US3760803 (BOOTHBY L); | [X]US4314568 (LOVING JAMES A); | [A]US4834802 (PRIER DAVID A [US]) |