EP0573605 - PREPARATION OF FACTOR IX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 29.06.2001 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.06.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 16.08.2001 [2001/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC RORER INTERNATIONAL (HOLDINGS) INC. 3711 Kennett Pike, Suite 200 Greenville, Delaware 19807 / US | [2001/04] |
Former [1995/52] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC RORER INTERNATIONAL (HOLDINGS) INC. 5711 Kennett Pike, Suite 200 Greenville, Delaware 19807 / US | ||
Former [1993/50] | For all designated states RHONE-POULENC RORER INTERNATIONAL (HOLDINGS) INC. Delaware Corporate Center I, 1 Righter Parkway, Suite 114 Wilmington, Delaware 19803 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HUANG, Chin, C. 53 Briarcliff Lane Bourbonnais, IL 60914 / US | 02 /
ENKOJI, Takashi 410 Seward Street Park Forest, IL 60466 / US | 03 /
HO, Laura 5 Oxford Place Bourbonnais, IL 60914 / US | 04 /
KLESZYNSKI, Richard, R. Rural Route 6, Box HE41 St. Anne, IL 60964 / US | 05 /
WEEKS, Richard, L. Rural Route 1, Box 849 Kankakee, IL 60901 / US | 06 /
FELDMAN, Fred 870 St. Andrews Way Frankfort, IL 60423 / US | [1993/50] | Representative(s) | Lauppe, Hans Friedrich, et al Aventis Behring GmbH Postfach 12 30 35002 Marburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1996/19] | Lauppe, Hans Friedrich, Dr., et al Centeon Pharma GmbH, Postfach 12 30 35002 Marburg / DE | ||
Former [1993/50] | Le Pennec, Magali, et al RHONE-POULENC RORER SA, Direction des Brevets, 20 Avenue Raymond Aron F-92165 Antony Cédex / FR | Application number, filing date | 92908513.2 | 26.02.1992 | [1993/50] | WO1992US01600 | Priority number, date | US19910662927 | 01.03.1991 Original published format: US 662927 | [1993/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9215324 | Date: | 17.09.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/24] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0573605 | Date: | 15.12.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.09.1992 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/50] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0573605 | Date: | 30.08.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/35] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 17.09.1992 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.1994 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/36, C12N9/64 | [2000/15] | CPC: |
C12N9/644 (EP,US);
A61K38/4846 (EP,US);
A61K47/02 (EP,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,US);
A61P7/02 (EP);
C07K16/40 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1994/40] | A61K37/547, C12N9/64 | ||
Former IPC [1993/50] | A61K37/547 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, SE [1993/50] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON FAKTOR-IX | [1993/50] | English: | PREPARATION OF FACTOR IX | [1993/50] | French: | PREPARATION DE FACTEUR IX | [1993/50] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.1993 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.1993 | Search fee paid | 23.09.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.09.1992 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: DE | 23.09.1993 | Examination requested [1993/50] | 14.09.1998 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.02.1999 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.05.1999 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 17.01.2000 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 11.02.2000 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.05.2000 | Fee for grant paid | 22.05.2000 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 31.05.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/33] | Request for further processing for: | 07.05.1999 | Request for further processing filed | 07.05.1999 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 25.05.1999 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.01.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.01.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.01.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.02.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 26.01.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 05.02.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 03.02.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP0496725 (IMMUNO AG [AT]) [E] 1-5,7-10,12,13,15,16,18,21,26-31* example 1 * | International search | [X]US4379085 (WILLIAMS CRAIGENNE A, et al); | [A]US4405603 (SCHWINN HORST [DE], et al); | [A]US4411794 (SCHWINN HORST [DE], et al); | [A]US4687664 (PHILAPITSCH ANTON [AT], et al); | [A]US4725673 (HERRING STEVEN W [US]); | [Y]US4770999 (KAUFMAN RANDAL J [US], et al); | [XY]US4786726 (SMITH KENNETH J [US]); | [A]US4981952 (YAN S BETTY [US]); | [AP]US5055557 (ZIMMERMAN THEODORE S [US]); | [AP]US5061789 (MOELLER WOLFGANG [DE], et al); | [AP]US5071961 (KRAUS MICHAEL [DE], et al) | [XY] - Vox Sanguinis, Volume 57, issued November 1989, T. BURNOUF et al., "Properties of a highly purified human plasma factor IX:c therapeutic concentrate prepared by conventional chromatography", pages 225-232, see page 226, "Materials and Methods" and "Purification", pages 227-228, Fig. 3 and Tables 1-2. | [XY] - Proceedings of the National Academy of Sciences USA, Volume 82, issued June 1985, H.A. LIEBMAN et al., "Immunoaffinity purification of factor IX (Christmas factor) by using conformation-specific antibodies directed against the factor IX-metal complex", pages 3879-3883, see pages 3880 and 3882, Table 1 and Figs. 5-6. | [A] - Vox Sanguinis, Volume 58, issued January 1990, J. THARAKAN et al., "Development of an immunoaffinity process for factor IX purification", pages 21-29, see entire document. | [X] - Thrombosis Research, Volume 55, issued 01 July 1989, S.S. AHMAD et al., "Rapid purification of factor IX, factor X and prothrombin by immunoaffinity and ion exchange chromatography", pages 121-133, see pages 123-127, Figures 1-2, Table I. |