Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP0565728
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
16.01.1998 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] |
24.01.1997 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 12.03.1997 [1997/11] |
22.11.1996 |
Change - designated states |
published on 08.01.1997 [1997/02] |
08.11.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
21.09.1996 |
Renewal fee |
|
18.07.1996 |
Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
27.06.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
24.04.1996 |
Examination report or reply |
|
04.07.1994 |
First examination report |
|
22.01.1994 |
Change - representative |
published on 16.03.1994 [1994/11] |
16.12.1993 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 02.02.1994 [1994/05] |
03.09.1993 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 20.10.1993 [1993/42] |
03.09.1993 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 20.10.1993 [1993/42] |