EP0565728 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING EXHAUST GAS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.01.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 04.03.1998 [1998/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku, Osaka 530 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1993/42] | For all designated states DAIKIN INDUSTRIES, LTD. Umeda Center Building 4-12, Nakazaki-nishi 2-chome Kita-ku, Osaka 530 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IZUMO, Masanori, Daikin Industries, Ltd. Yodogawaseisakusho 1-1, Nishihitotsuya Settsu-shi Osaka 566 / JP | [1993/42] | Representative(s) | Beetz & Partner mbB Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstraße 54 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/11] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | ||
Former [1993/42] | Patentanwälte Beetz - Timpe - Siegfried Schmitt-Fumian - Mayr Steinsdorfstrasse 10 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 92918879.5 | 03.09.1992 | [1993/42] | WO1992JP01126 | Priority number, date | JP19910226237 | 05.09.1991 Original published format: JP 22623791 | [1993/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO9304766 | Date: | 18.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0565728 | Date: | 20.10.1993 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.1993 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [1993/42] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0565728 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.1993 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.12.1993 | Classification | IPC: | B01D53/44 | [1994/05] | CPC: |
B01D53/08 (EP,US);
B01D46/24 (EP,US);
B01D53/04 (EP,US);
B01D53/10 (EP,US);
B01D53/38 (EP,US);
B01D2253/102 (EP,US);
B01D2253/108 (EP,US);
B01D2253/3425 (EP,US);
B01D2257/90 (EP,US);
B01D2258/01 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [1993/42] | B01D53/34 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1997/02] |
Former [1993/42] | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE | Title | German: | METHODE UND EINRICHTUNG ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ABGAS | [1993/42] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING EXHAUST GAS | [1993/42] | French: | PROCEDE ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT | [1993/42] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.1993 | Translation filed | 29.06.1993 | National basic fee paid | 29.06.1993 | Search fee paid | 29.06.1993 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.06.1993 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.1993 | Examination requested [1993/42] | 08.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.07.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 15.09.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 18.04.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.06.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.07.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 22.07.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 29.10.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 29.10.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 08.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 26.07.1993 | BE   M01   Fee paid on   29.07.1993 | 26.07.1993 | DE   M01   Fee paid on   29.07.1993 | 26.07.1993 | ES   M01   Fee paid on   29.07.1993 | 26.07.1993 | FR   M01   Fee paid on   29.07.1993 | 26.07.1993 | GB   M01   Fee paid on   29.07.1993 | 26.07.1993 | IT   M01   Fee paid on   29.07.1993 | 26.07.1993 | NL   M01   Fee paid on   29.07.1993 | 26.07.1993 | SE   M01   Fee paid on   29.07.1993 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP0021558 (ALLIS CHALMERS [US]) [Y] 1,3,5,7,9 * page 6, line 7 - page 18, line 21; figure 1 *; | [Y]DE4002554 (KLOECKNER HUMBOLDT DEUTZ AG [DE]) [Y] 1,3,5,7,9 * the whole document *; | [A]EP0405290 (RHEINISCHE BRAUNKOHLENW AG [DE], et al) [A] 1,3,5,6 * column 5, line 16 - column 8, line 2; figures 1,2 *; | [A]EP0253563 (NIRO ATOMIZER AS [DK]); | [A]WO9101792 (STAUDINGER GERNOT [AT]); | [A]EP0196481 (VON ROLL AG [CH]) | International search | [X]JPS53147693 (NIPPON ELECTRIC CO); | [A]JPS49133294 ; | [Y]JPS5291790 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]JPS5292877 (HITACHI LTD); | [A]JPS6051532 (SMIDTH & CO AS F L) |